U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02563
  • Case Name: Mott v. Walton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.