U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01471
  • Case Name: Watts v. Cameron Ashley Building Products Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.