U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Albert, Jr. v. Topgolf U S A L F L L C
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Joseph]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.