U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00638
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute]
  • April 11, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet Submitted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.