U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-00720
  • Case Name: Habbal v. Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default (Form Included)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued - All (Form Included)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.