U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Alvarez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.