U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00651
  • Case Name: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC v. Arroyo Terminals, LLC, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 13, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2025: [Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 08, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request for Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.