U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villanueva
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.