U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10298
  • Case Name: Pamela N. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Motion to Reduce Attorney Fees]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Information]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Deficiency for Incorrect Event - form]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Financial Management Course]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.