U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20162
  • Case Name: Delward Reddick, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held - Chapter 12/13]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.