U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10489
  • Case Name: Sealkeata Fleeks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CHAP Confirmation Hearing Continued - Do Not Use]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - SHV]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Modify Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Approval/Denial to Incur Debt]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Modify Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.