U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10304
  • Case Name: Talicia S. Cavalier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice of Returned Mail]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [none]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.