U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10300
  • Case Name: Ivette Leitis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Chapter 7 Proceeding Memo-Meeting of Creditors Held]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Payment Advices]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Domestic Support Information]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [none]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.