U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50301
  • Case Name: Luz Delalva Remigio
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7 - No Exceptions]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Amended Schedules D,E/F (Fee)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Amended Schedules A/B,C,G,H (No Fee)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.