U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10401
  • Case Name: Precious Dillard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Relief from Stay (Fee)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Abandon (Fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.