U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00337
  • Case Name: Bourgeois et al v. Pennsylvania General Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2025: [Joinder]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 12, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 12, 2025: [Joinder]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2025: [Joinder]
  • May 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 09, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [In Limine]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • May 06, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 02, 2025: [Joinder]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 29, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 25, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request/Statement of Oral Argument]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request/Statement of Oral Argument]
  • April 15, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.