U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02370
  • Case Name: Demas et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.