U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01553
  • Case Name: Frye v. Walmart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Cain/LeBlanc]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (consent case)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motions Transferred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.