U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00465
  • Case Name: Deglandon v. Rasallen Management Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Issued - All (Form Included)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.