U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10694
  • Case Name: Moyvane-Arabian Properties, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedule H]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedule G]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedule D]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedule A/B]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M [Interim Order (Sua Sponte) (Order)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M [06Employ with Affidavit of Disinterestedness (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M [Scheduling Status Conference Chapter 11 SubChapterV (Order)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Resolution (PF)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.