U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30426
  • Case Name: Diressia Garner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Waiver of Tax Refund Pledge]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Employee Income Records]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor - caseupload]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (MON) E. Eugene [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13, All Schedules & Statements - case upload (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.