U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Cross Lake Plaza of Louisiana L L C v. Atlantic Casualty Insurance Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • May 02, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • May 01, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.