U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00467
  • Case Name: Emrit et al v. World Intellectual Property Organization et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 07, 2025: [Fee Letter for Appeal Filing Fee]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 23, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 10, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.