U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10306
  • Case Name: Renee B. Robins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Chapter 7 Proceeding Memo-Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Notice of Deficiency for Incorrect Event - form]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Amended Schedules A/B, G, H, I, or J]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Asset]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Payment Advices]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [none]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.