U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50304
  • Case Name: Jamie M. Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7 - No Exceptions]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Voluntary Petition - All Chapters]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.