U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10406
  • Case Name: Mikea D. Beene
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule J]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule I]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule H]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule G]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule D]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule C]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.