U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50302
  • Case Name: Dorian Erik Fawvor and Tiffany Olivier Fawvor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Court Hearing Notice - Set]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.