U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10046
  • Case Name: Barbara M. Picot
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Discharging Chapter 7 Debtor(s) - form]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Court Audio Docketed]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Set Hearing on Reaffirmation Agreement - Not Signed By Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Not Signed By Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Deficiency for Incorrect Event - form]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Court Audio Docketed]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Minute Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.