U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10409
  • Case Name: Nicholas Cash Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed, converted, or reassigned, no funds]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Support Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments for Chapter 7, 12 or 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income 122A-1 and Exemption of Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Schedule I]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Dismiss Case - Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Notice of Deficiency/Required Documents]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 7]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Schedule J]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Support Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.