U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00365
  • Case Name: Green et al v. Loving Hearts, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • May 13, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.