U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00476
  • Case Name: Candelas et al v. Tennessee Steel Haulers L L C et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Response (NOT Motions)]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.