U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10706
  • Case Name: Curtis Jackson and Louwan G. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification About a Financial Management Course Jt Db]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification About a Financial Management Course Db (PF)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [zDocument - Proof of Payment to Trustee]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Amended Schedules D, E, F, E/F or Amended List of Creditors (Fee, if apply.) (PF)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal of Real Estate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Appraisal of Real Estate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Jt Db]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Jt Db]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Statement - Private]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.