U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50075
  • Case Name: Brandy Felicia Malveaux
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice to Withdraw Claim]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - LAF]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13 - No Exceptions]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Statement of Adjourning/Continuing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.