U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50120
  • Case Name: Leo K. Meyers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - LAF]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice to Withdraw Claim]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13 - No Exceptions]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Statement of Adjourning/Continuing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.