U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80209
  • Case Name: Shanita Bowens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13 - No Exceptions]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re:]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Employee Income Records]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.