U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10268
  • Case Name: Michael Anthony Sarah
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Discharging Debtor(s) (Order)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Discharging Debtor(s) (Order)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Dismiss One Debtor (Order)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Dismiss One Debtor (Order)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera-Fulton, Barbara [Denying Discharge (Order)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Denying Discharge (Order)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.