U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11068
  • Case Name: Shamika Lee Harris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Closing Chapter 7 No Asset Case]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Compensation]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Sell]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [NOA Matters]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Discharging Chapter 7 Debtor(s) - form]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Striking Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Subordination of Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Compensation (Application)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Sell]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.