U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10538
  • Case Name: Windy P. Walpool
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Modify Plan]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - SHV]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Modify Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Approval/Denial to Incur Debt]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Modify Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.