U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01636
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Walmart Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • May 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • April 11, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 11, 2025: [Exhibit List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.