U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10309
  • Case Name: Calvin Leon Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Request to Reschedule Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Declaration ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Amended Schedule C]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Notice of Deficiency for Failure to use Current Form - form]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Payment Advices]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [none]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.