U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10308
  • Case Name: Chevis G. Bellock
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Schedule I]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Schedule J]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Obligation Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Acknowledgement of Terms for Chapter 13 plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.