U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50310
  • Case Name: Tracy Renee Cothron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income 122A-1 and Exemption of Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Extending Bar Date for Complaints]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [First Meeting of Creditors Statement of Adjourning/Continuing]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sikes, Lucy G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.