U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Hancock Whitney Bank v. W. Mammoth Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 14, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • May 02, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2025: [Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.