U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Day v. American Security Insurance Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.