U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01200
  • Case Name: Velez Caicedo v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.