U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Watts et al v. Atlas Copco Compressors L L C et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 14, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.