U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Arq Solutions Red River L L C v. Harris Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.