U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10613
  • Case Name: Sharlanda Smith-Lazard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Minute Entry]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Court Audio Docketed]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Confirming Modification of Plan (all chapters)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [NOA Matters]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Trustee's Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Response]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Modified Chapter 13 Plan (post-confirmation)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Hearing (Amended)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Deficiency for Incorrect PDF Attached - form]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Schedules A/B, G, H, I, or J]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Modified Chapter 13 Plan (post-confirmation)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Convert Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.