U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00719
  • Case Name: Williams v. American Family Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • April 13, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.