U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00871
  • Case Name: Lanns v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04]
  • April 30, 2025: [60 Day Order of Dismissal]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.